Global Patent Index - EP 0989860 A1

EP 0989860 A1 2000-04-05 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INACTIVATING INFECTIOUS AGENTS USING LACTOFERRIN AND RELATED MOLECULES

Title (en)

METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INACTIVATING INFECTIOUS AGENTS USING LACTOFERRIN AND RELATED MOLECULES

Title (de)

METHODEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR INAKTIVIERUNG INFEKTIOESER AGENTIEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON LAKTOFERRIN UND VERWANDTEN MOLEKUELEN

Title (fr)

METHODES ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT D'INACTIVER DES AGENTS INFECTIEUX AU MOYEN DE LACTOFERRINE ET DE MOLECULES ASSOCIEES

Publication

EP 0989860 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99917408 A

Priority

  • US 9907931 W
  • US 8156498 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9952545A1] A method for substantially reducing the pathogenicity of an infectious agent, without killing the infectious agent, by removing or degrading a surface protein of the infectious agent, by contacting the infectious agent with substantially pure, non-pasteurized, naturally occurring lactoferrin under conditions sufficient to remove or degrade the protein, is disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/40; A61K 39/02; A61K 39/12; A61K 39/145; C07K 14/79

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/16 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 38/40 (2006.01); A61K 39/02 (2006.01); A61K 39/102 (2006.01); A61K 39/12 (2006.01); A61K 39/145 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/79 (2006.01); C12N 7/04 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 7/00 (2013.01); A61K 38/1709 (2013.01); A61K 39/102 (2013.01); C07K 14/79 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/541 (2013.01); C12N 2760/16061 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IE LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9952545 A1 19991021; AU 3554099 A 19991101; CA 2294018 A1 19991021; EP 0989860 A1 20000405; EP 0989860 A4 20000719; JP 2002508009 A 20020312

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050315

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030929

2000-07-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000606

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IE LI LU NL SE

2000-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 38/40 A, 7A 61K 39/02 B, 7A 61K 39/12 B, 7A 61K 39/145 B, 7C 07K 14/79 B, 7A 61P 31/04 B

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IE LI LU NL SE