Global Patent Index - EP 0989860 A4

EP 0989860 A4 2000-07-19 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INACTIVATING INFECTIOUS AGENTS USING LACTOFERRIN AND RELATED MOLECULES

Title (en)

METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INACTIVATING INFECTIOUS AGENTS USING LACTOFERRIN AND RELATED MOLECULES

Title (de)

METHODEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR INAKTIVIERUNG INFEKTIOESER AGENTIEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON LAKTOFERRIN UND VERWANDTEN MOLEKUELEN

Title (fr)

METHODES ET COMPOSITIONS PERMETTANT D'INACTIVER DES AGENTS INFECTIEUX AU MOYEN DE LACTOFERRINE ET DE MOLECULES ASSOCIEES

Publication

EP 0989860 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99917408 A

Priority

  • US 9907931 W
  • US 8156498 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9952545A1] A method for substantially reducing the pathogenicity of an infectious agent, without killing the infectious agent, by removing or degrading a surface protein of the infectious agent, by contacting the infectious agent with substantially pure, non-pasteurized, naturally occurring lactoferrin under conditions sufficient to remove or degrade the protein, is disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/40; A61K 39/02; A61K 39/12; A61K 39/145; A61P 31/04; C07K 14/79

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/50 (2006.01); A61K 38/16 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 38/40 (2006.01); A61K 39/02 (2006.01); A61K 39/102 (2006.01); A61K 39/12 (2006.01); A61K 39/145 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/79 (2006.01); C12N 7/04 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 7/00 (2013.01); A61K 38/1709 (2013.01); A61K 39/102 (2013.01); C07K 14/79 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/541 (2013.01); C12N 2760/16061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9705884 A1 19970220 - NEW ENGLAND MEDICAL CENTER INC [US]
  • [Y] US 5304633 A 19940419 - TOMITA MAMORU [JP], et al
  • [Y] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199145, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class B04, AN 1991-329196, XP002138451
  • [Y] QUI, J., ET AL.: "Human milk lactoferrin extracts the IgA protease precursor from the outer membrane of growing Heamophilus influenzae cells", ABSTRACTS OF THE INTERSCIENCE CONFERENCE ON ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY AND MEETING INFO OF THE 35TH INTERSCIENCE CONFERENCE ON ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY SAN FRANCISCO, SEPT- 17-20, vol. 35, no. 0, 1995, california, usa, pages 160, XP000886820
  • [Y] WITTLER, M., ET AL.: "Neutralization of streptococcus sanguis IgA-1 protease by lactoferrin and transferrin", JOURNAL OF DENTAL RESEARCH AND MEETING INFO.: JOINT MEETING OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR DENTAL RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF DENTAL RESEARCH AND THE CANADIAN ASSOCIATION OF DENTAL RESEARCH CHICAGO, 10-14, 1993, vol. 72, 1993, illinois, usa, pages 327, XP000886807
  • [X] LEGRAND, D., ET AL.: "Evidence for interactions between the 30kDa N- and 50kDa C-terminal tryptic fragments of human lactotransferrin", BIOCHEM. J., vol. 236, 1986, pages 839 - 844, XP002921478
  • See also references of WO 9952545A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IE LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9952545 A1 19991021; AU 3554099 A 19991101; CA 2294018 A1 19991021; EP 0989860 A1 20000405; EP 0989860 A4 20000719; JP 2002508009 A 20020312

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050315

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030929

2000-07-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000606

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IE LI LU NL SE

2000-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 38/40 A, 7A 61K 39/02 B, 7A 61K 39/12 B, 7A 61K 39/145 B, 7C 07K 14/79 B, 7A 61P 31/04 B

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IE LI LU NL SE