Global Patent Index - EP 0989949 B1

EP 0989949 B1 2001-12-12 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING A THREADING STRIP OR A MATERIAL STRIP

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR TRANSFERRING A THREADING STRIP OR A MATERIAL STRIP

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERFÜHREN EINES EINFÄDELSTREIFENS ODER EINER MATERIALBAHN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR LE TRANSPORT D'UN RUBAN D'ENFILAGE OU D'UNE BANDE DE MATERIAU

Publication

EP 0989949 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98932137 A

Priority

  • DE 19724123 A
  • EP 9803446 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19724123A1] The invention relates to a device for transferring a threading strip or material strip in a machine used to produce and/or process said material web from a take-over area to a hand-over area along a web path. Said device is characterized in that it has at least one receiving device which for transferring the threading strip or material web from the take-over area to the hand-over area can be displaced at a speed which is lower, especially significantly lower, than the operating speed with which the threading strip or material web are fed through the machine during the transfer process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 20/00; D21F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/00 (2006.01); B65H 23/28 (2006.01); B65H 23/30 (2006.01); D21F 5/04 (2006.01); D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 20/16 (2013.01); D21G 9/0072 (2013.01); B65H 2301/522 (2013.01); B65H 2801/84 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19724123 A1 19981210; AT 210591 T 20011215; CA 2297184 A1 19981217; EP 0989949 A1 20000405; EP 0989949 B1 20011212; JP 2002503194 A 20020129; KR 20010013592 A 20010226; US 6425513 B1 20020730; WO 9856701 A1 19981217

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070610

2008-02-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070609

2006-06-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-06-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050609

2004-07-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040709

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040623

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802452 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210591 T 20011215

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-05-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000110

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT SE