Global patent index - EP 0989950 A1

EP 0989950 A1 2000-04-05 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR WINDING STRAND-SHAPED WINDING MATERIAL ONTO A COIL

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR WINDING STRAND-SHAPED WINDING MATERIAL ONTO A COIL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM AUFWICKELN VON STRANGFÖRMIGEM WICKELGUT AUF EINE SPULE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'ENROULEMENT SUR UNE BOBINE D'UNE MATIERE A ENROULER EN FORME DE FIL

Publication

EP 0989950 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936175 A

Priority

  • DE 9801630 W
  • DE 19726285 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19726285A1] Strand-shaped winding material (WM) is continuously supplied to a coil (SP), whereby the position of the winding material (WM) is monitored by at least one TV camera (VC). The winding data thus obtained is fed to a computer (CU) resulting in a corresponding adjustment. The position of the vertex points for at least two windings (WD22, WD23) in a new winding position (WL2) is radially determined in relation to the axis of the coil (AX). The supply of the winding material is adjusted accordingly when said vertex points deviate from a set-point value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/2878 (2013.01); B65H 54/2875 (2013.01); B65H 2553/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858865A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19726285 A1 19981224; AT 290986 T 20050415; CA 2295041 A1 19981230; CN 1261323 A 20000726; EP 0989950 A1 20000405; EP 0989950 B1 20050316; JP 2002508731 A 20020319; US 6443385 B1 20020903; WO 9858865 A1 19981230

INPADOC legal status

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050616

2006-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060620

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051219

2006-02-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-10-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-04-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59812661

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-03-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE

2005-03-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-03-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-03-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050316

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CCS TECHNOLOGY, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991206

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FI FR GB IT LI SE