Global Patent Index - EP 0989951 A1

EP 0989951 A1 2000-04-05 - YARN TENSION DEVICE

Title (en)

YARN TENSION DEVICE

Title (de)

FADENBREMSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF TENDEUR

Publication

EP 0989951 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99920671 A

Priority

  • DE 29806739 U
  • EP 9902523 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9952806A1] The invention relates to a yarn tension device, especially a two-disk brake for textile threads (4) running off of creels (1), comprising two pairs (32, 33) of brake disks through which the same thread passes. The upper and lower disks (32', 33', 32", 33") of these pairs are adjustably pressed together in order to tense the thread (4) passing through, by means of a two-armed disk lever (17). Said lever is located underneath the pairs (32, 33) of brake disks, from which location it can influence the pressure loads of one of the disk pairs (32, 33) with one lever arm (17', 17") respectively. The yarn tension device also has a pressure regulating device which acts on the disk lever (17). The aim of the invention is to provide a device of this type which can be used for fine threads with pressure forces starting from zero and for coarser threads with much greater pressure forces, without having to change the pressure-regulating device or its springs (20). To this end, the two-armed disk lever (17) is able to raise the lower disks (32', 33') of the pairs (32, 33) of brake disks out of an operating position in which the upper disks (32", 33") are subjected to practically no pressure and the pressure-regulating device acts on the disk lever (17) with a rocking lever (15). Said rocking lever has working points of an actuating power-producing element (20) which are situated at different distances from the disk lever (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 59/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/225 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9952806A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29806739 U1 19990902; BR 9906354 A 20000919; CN 1138692 C 20040218; CN 1263509 A 20000816; EP 0989951 A1 20000405; EP 0989951 B1 20010801; ES 2161565 T3 20011201; TR 199903078 T1 20001121; US 6283399 B1 20010904; WO 9952806 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900177

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59900177

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100414

2010-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SUCKER TEXTILMASCHINEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100427

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TEXMAG-ABWICKLUNGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH

- Free text: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH#HEINRICH-HERTZ-STRASSE 28#07552 GERA (DE) -TRANSFER TO- TEXMAG-ABWICKLUNGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH#HEINRICH-HERTZ-STRASSE 28#07552 GERA (DE)

2008-09-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SUCKER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Free text: TEXMAG-ABWICKLUNGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH#HEINRICH-HERTZ-STRASSE 28#07552 GERA (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SUCKER TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH#BLUMENBERGER STRASSE 143-145#41061 MOENCHENGLADBACH (DE)

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080411

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Free text: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH#HEINRICH-HERTZ-STRASSE 28#07552 GERA (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH#HEINRICH-HERTZ-STRASSE 28#07552 GERA (DE)

2007-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060415

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-04-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060415

2005-05-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Free text: SUCKER-MUELLER-HACOBA GMBH & CO.#KREFELDER STRASSE 690#D-41066 MOENCHENGLADBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH#HEINRICH-HERTZ-STRASSE 28#07552 GERA (DE)

2005-04-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050415

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-12-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2161565 T3

2001-11-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011105

2001-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900177 20010906

2001-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2001-08-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010801

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991208

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT