Global Patent Index - EP 0989980 A1

EP 0989980 A1 2000-04-05 - NOVEL TRICYCLIC SULFONAMIDE INHIBITORS OF FARNESYL-PROTEIN TRANSFERASE

Title (en)

NOVEL TRICYCLIC SULFONAMIDE INHIBITORS OF FARNESYL-PROTEIN TRANSFERASE

Title (de)

NEUE TRIZYKLISCHE SULFONAMID INHIBITOREN DER FARNESYL-PROTEIN TRANSFERASE

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX SULFONAMIDES TRICYCLIQUES INHIBITEURS DE LA FARNESYLE TRANSFERASE

Publication

EP 0989980 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98932718 A

Priority

  • US 9811508 W
  • US 87705097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857949A1] Novel tricyclic sulfonamide compounds of formula (1.0) and pharmaceutical compositions are disclosed which are inhibitors of the enzyme, farnesyl protein transferase. Also disclosed is a method of inhibiting Ras function and therefore inhibiting the abnormal growth of cells. The method comprises administering the novel sulfonamide compound to a biological system. In particular, the method inhibits the abnormal growth of cells in a mammal such as a human.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 401/04; A61K 31/435; A61K 31/445; A61K 31/55; C07D 221/16; C07D 401/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/4545 (2006.01); A61K 31/496 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07D 221/16 (2006.01); C07D 401/06 (2006.01); C07D 401/14 (2006.01); C07D 413/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 401/04 (2013.01); C07D 221/16 (2013.01); C07D 401/14 (2013.01); C07D 413/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9857949A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

LT LV RO

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857949 A1 19981223; AR 012989 A1 20001122; AU 8253698 A 19990104; CA 2293358 A1 19981223; CA 2293358 C 20080805; CN 1267290 A 20000920; CO 4940475 A1 20000724; EP 0989980 A1 20000405; HU 0004627 A2 20011028; IL 133393 D0 20010430; JP 2002507192 A 20020305; KR 20010013826 A 20010226; NZ 501619 A 20020201; PE 86199 A1 19990924; ZA 9805218 B 19981215

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070411

2007-01-19 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1024907

2007-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07D 401/04 20060101AFI20061115BHEP

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030211

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000110

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000110;LV PAYMENT 20000110;RO PAYMENT 20000110