Global Patent Index - EP 0990019 A1

EP 0990019 A1 2000-04-05 - METHOD FOR REPROCESSING USED OIL

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REPROCESSING USED OIL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ALTÖLAUFARBEITUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE RETRAITEMENT D'HUILE USAGEE

Publication

EP 0990019 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98937405 A

Priority

  • DE 9801717 W
  • DE 19725640 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19725640C1] The invention relates to a method for reprocessing used oil by separating off recyclable base oils, gas oils and heavy oils, separating the proportions of water and salt. The inventive method is characterised in that a proportion of fluid from the group of hydrocarbons and a proportion of gaseous hydrogen are added to the used oil being processed, said fluid having been converted into the supercritical aggregate state through the action of pressure and temperature. The three-part mixture of the constituents of the used oil, the fluid and the hydrogen then proceeds to the processing stage which uses at least one catalyst and one separator. The fluid and hydrogen gas mixture which is discharged from the separator passes through a closed circuit during the process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 175/00; C10G 45/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 45/02 (2006.01); C10M 175/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 175/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858043A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19725640 C1 19980806; EP 0990019 A1 20000405; EP 0990019 B1 20011017; ES 2166178 T3 20020401; JP 2002504176 A 20020205; WO 9858043 A1 19981223

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070618

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070619

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070619

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070618

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070618

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060626

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060621

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060601

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DEUTSCHE AMPHIBOLIN-WERKE VON ROBERT MURJAHN GMBH

2002-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2166178 T3

2002-03-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020121

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801794 20011122

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-30 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: HAMMER, ERNST EKKEHARD

2001-05-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAMMER, ERNST EKKEHARD

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010301

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT