Global Patent Index - EP 0990020 A1

EP 0990020 A1 2000-04-05 - METHOD FOR WASHING CLOTHES, IN PARTICULAR WORKING CLOTHES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR WASHING CLOTHES, IN PARTICULAR WORKING CLOTHES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM WASCHEN VON WÄSCHE, INSBESONDERE VON BERUFSBEKLEIDUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE LAVAGE DU LINGE, EN PARTICULIER DE VETEMENTS DE TRAVAIL

Publication

EP 0990020 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98937476 A

Priority

  • DE 19726287 A
  • EP 9803543 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19726287A1] The invention relates to a method for washing clothes, in particular working clothes. The clothes are washed in a washing machine of the type commonly used in industrial laundries, using a combination of products comprising at least two components: (A) a washing alkali component containing (A1) an anionic surfactant and a water-soluble silicate, and/or (A2) an alkali hydroxide and (A3) complex-forming agents; and (B) a surfactant component preferably containing a nonionic surfactant. After washing, the wastewater is treated in a membrane filtering system. Unlike known agents, the inventive product combination comprising components A and B does not negatively affect wastewater treatment in the membrane filtration system. In particular, it does not block the membranes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/83; C11D 3/02; C11D 3/08; C11D 3/12; C11D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/36 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/06 (2006.01); C11D 1/12 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/29 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/722 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 3/364 (2013.01); C11D 11/0017 (2013.01); C11D 11/0076 (2013.01); C11D 1/06 (2013.01); C11D 1/12 (2013.01); C11D 1/123 (2013.01); C11D 1/126 (2013.01); C11D 1/14 (2013.01); C11D 1/29 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01); C11D 1/722 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9859025A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19726287 A1 19981224; AT 222284 T 20020815; BR 9810220 A 20000808; CA 2295015 A1 19981230; CA 2295015 C 20091201; DK 0990020 T3 20021104; EP 0990020 A1 20000405; EP 0990020 B1 20020814; NO 996307 A 19991217; NO 996307 D0 19991217; PL 187141 B1 20040531; PL 337508 A1 20000828; US 6398820 B1 20020604; WO 9859025 A1 19981230

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160516

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160607

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-03-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59805198

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GODEMEYER BLUM LENZE PARTNERSCHAFT, PATENTANWA, DE

2014-03-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59805198

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GODEMEYER BLUM LENZE PATENTANWAELTE, PARTNERSC, DE

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070612

2007-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070101

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060612

2007-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070101

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060612

2005-05-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050506

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-02-08 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-01-31 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ECOLAB G.M.B.H. & CO. OHG

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040613

2004-06-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040612

2003-09-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030902

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-06-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030616

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-13 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030613

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030611

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030604

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805198

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-19

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 222284

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-07-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ECOLAB GMBH & CO. OHG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010424

2000-04-26 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17P

- Effective date: 19991211

2000-04-12 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17P

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991230

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE