Global Patent Index - EP 0990028 A1

EP 0990028 A1 2000-04-05 - SCREENING FOR PHOSPHATIDYLINOSITOL RELATED-KINASE INHIBITORS

Title (en)

SCREENING FOR PHOSPHATIDYLINOSITOL RELATED-KINASE INHIBITORS

Title (de)

SCREENING AUF INHIBITOREN DER PHOSPHATIDYLINOSITOL VERWANDTEN KINASE

Title (fr)

CRIBLAGE D'INHIBITEURS DE LA KINASE LIEE AU PHOSPHATIDILYNOSITOL

Publication

EP 0990028 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98930061 A

Priority

  • US 9811420 W
  • US 4886997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9855602A1] A method for identifying a compound inhibiting the phosphorylation activity of a phosphoinositide 3-kinase related kinase polypeptide is described. Antibodies having specific binding affinity for a conjugate including wortmannin are also described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 9/12; C12Q 1/48; C12Q 1/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/12 (2006.01); C12Q 1/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/1205 (2013.01); C12Q 1/48 (2013.01); G01N 2333/91215 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9855602 A1 19981210; WO 9855602 A9 19990408; AU 7953598 A 19981221; CA 2292540 A1 19981210; EP 0990028 A1 20000405; EP 0990028 A4 20000927

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020503

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011023

2000-09-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ABRAHAM, ROBERT, T.

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SARKARIA, JANN, N.

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE