Global Patent Index - EP 0990034 A1

EP 0990034 A1 2000-04-05 - ANTI-GPIIB/IIIA RECOMBINANT ANTIBODIES

Title (en)

ANTI-GPIIB/IIIA RECOMBINANT ANTIBODIES

Title (de)

ANTI-GPIIB/IIIA REKOMBINANTE ANTIKÖRPER

Title (fr)

ANTICORPS RECOMBINES ANTI-GPIIB/IIIA

Publication

EP 0990034 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98934922 A

Priority

  • DE 19723904 A
  • DE 19755227 A
  • DE 19820663 A
  • EP 9803397 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9855619A1] The invention relates to novel nucleic acid sequences which code for human auto-antibodies and anti-idiotypic antibodies against blood platelet membrane proteins. The invention also relates to new amino acid sequences of human antibodies and to the use thereof in the diagnosis and therapy of diseases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/13; A61K 39/395; A61K 48/00; C07K 16/18; C07K 16/42; C12N 5/10; C12N 15/63; G01N 33/577

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/04 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 7/06 (2006.01); C07K 7/08 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/13 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/2848 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855619A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9855619 A1 19981210; AU 745965 B2 20020411; AU 8436798 A 19981221; CA 2293693 A1 19981210; CN 1163599 C 20040825; CN 1263556 A 20000816; EP 0990034 A1 20000405; JP 2001513652 A 20010904; US 2004202659 A1 20041014; US 6790938 B1 20040914

INPADOC legal status


2009-07-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090106

2009-01-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1024264

2007-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050504

2005-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050504

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991203

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI LU NL SE