Global Patent Index - EP 0990037 A2

EP 0990037 A2 2000-04-05 - HUMAN CATALYTIC TELOMERASE SUB-UNIT AND ITS DIAGNOSTIC AND THERAPEUTIC USE

Title (en)

HUMAN CATALYTIC TELOMERASE SUB-UNIT AND ITS DIAGNOSTIC AND THERAPEUTIC USE

Title (de)

HUMANE KATALYTISCHE TELOMERASE-UNTEREINHEIT UND DEREN DIAGNOSTISCHE UND THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

SOUS-UNITE DE TELOMERASE CATALYTIQUE HUMAINE ET SON UTILISATION THERAPEUTIQUE ET DIAGNOSTIQUE

Publication

EP 0990037 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98932142 A

Priority

  • DE 19726329 A
  • DE 19813274 A
  • DE 19816496 A
  • EP 9803468 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9859040A2] The invention relates to the nucleotide sequence and the protein sequence derived therefrom, which encodes for the human catalytic telomerase sub-unit. The invention furthermore relates to methods involving a pharmaceutical, diagnostic or therapeutic use of this gene/protein, principally for treating cancer and ageing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/54; A61K 31/70; A61K 38/45; C07K 16/40; C12N 9/12; C12N 15/11; C12Q 1/48; C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/7088 (2006.01); A61K 38/43 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 16/40 (2006.01); C12N 9/12 (2006.01); C12Q 1/48 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/1241 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9859040A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9859040 A2 19981230; WO 9859040 A3 19990722; AU 745420 B2 20020321; AU 8214998 A 19990104; CA 2294646 A1 19981230; EP 0990037 A2 20000405; JP 2002508662 A 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER HEALTHCARE AG

2000-05-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HAGEN, GUSTAV

2000-05-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SIEGMUND, HANS-ULRICH

2000-05-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEICHEL, WALTER

2000-05-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WICK, MARESA

2000-05-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZUBOV, DMITRY

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000120

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE