Global Patent Index - EP 0990050 A1

EP 0990050 A1 2000-04-05 - ESTIMATION OF NUCLEIC ACID

Title (en)

ESTIMATION OF NUCLEIC ACID

Title (de)

KONZENTRATIONSBESTIMMUNG VON NUKLEINSÄUREN

Title (fr)

EVALUATION D'UN ACIDE NUCLEIQUE

Publication

EP 0990050 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98939776 A

Priority

  • GB 9802516 W
  • GB 9717932 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9910530A1] A method for the estimation of a property or parameter of a nucleic acid material, or of a process in which a nucleic acid is modified by a chemical or biochemical reaction, the property or parameter being one to which the electrical conductivity of the nucleic acid material is related, comprises measuring the electrical conductivity of the nucleic acid material, or of a reaction mixturecontaining the material, and estimating from the measurement the property or parameter of the material or process by reference to a predetermined relationship between electrical conductivity and the property or parameter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; G01N 27/02; G01N 33/487

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/483 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 27/02 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6825 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910530A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9910530 A1 19990304; CA 2300868 A1 19990304; CN 1267336 A 20000920; EP 0990050 A1 20000405; GB 9717932 D0 19971029; JP 2001514376 A 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020208

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MOLECULAR SENSORS LIMITED

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE