Global Patent Index - EP 0990055 A1

EP 0990055 A1 2000-04-05 - IMPROVEMENTS TO STEEL FOR FORMING TOOLS

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS TO STEEL FOR FORMING TOOLS

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE STÄHLE FÜR FORMGEBUNGSWERKZEUGE

Title (fr)

PERFECTIONNEMENTS APPORTES AUX ACIERS POUR OUTILS DE MISE EN FORME

Publication

EP 0990055 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98920603 A

Priority

  • FR 9800725 W
  • FR 9612339 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2754275A1] Steel made by powder metallurgy from pre-alloyed powder comprises by weight less than 1%, preferably 0.20-0.40% manganese, less than 1% preferably 0.20-0.40%, silicon, 6.05-6.45% chromium, 2.50-3.50% preferably 2.75-3.25%, molybdenum, 0.80-2% preferably 0.90-1.30% vanadium, less than 0.5% tungsten, less than 0.020% sulphur, less than 0.030% phosphorous, 0.60-1.60% preferably 0.70-1.10% niobium, 2-5% preferably 2.60-3.40% cobalt, 0.050-0.080% nitrogen, less than 0.060% aluminium, 0.75-0.95% preferably 0.78-0.85% carbon and less than 0.50 preferably less than 0.30% nickel, the remainder being iron and impurities.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 33/02; C22C 38/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 1/00 (2006.01); C22C 33/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/22 (2006.01); C22C 38/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/30 (2013.01); C22C 33/0285 (2013.01); C22C 38/001 (2013.01); C22C 38/22 (2013.01); C22C 38/24 (2013.01); C22C 38/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9953112A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2754275 A1 19980410; FR 2754275 B1 19981224; AT 221928 T 20020815; BR 9815563 A 20060214; DE 69807080 D1 20020912; DE 69807080 T2 20030206; EP 0990055 A1 20000405; EP 0990055 B1 20020807; ES 2181215 T3 20030216; WO 9953112 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110410

2012-06-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120604

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110409

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110409

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110409

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 221928 T

- Effective date: 20110409

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110409

2011-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69807080

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100413

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100317

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100430

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100416

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100406

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100329

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2005-04-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050409

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181215 T3

2002-09-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUGNION S.A.

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807080 20020912

2002-08-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES GB IT LI

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000120

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 221928 T 20020815

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011228

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000313

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES GB IT LI

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000120