Global Patent Index - EP 0990067 A1

EP 0990067 A1 2000-04-05 - STEAM IRON

Title (en)

STEAM IRON

Title (de)

DAMPFBÜGELEISEN

Title (fr)

FER A REPASSER A VAPEUR

Publication

EP 0990067 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936099 A

Priority

  • DE 9801526 W
  • DE 29710625 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19803811A1] The steam iron (1) has a valve rod (5) which is connected to a setting component (7) mounted in the iron handle (11). The component (7) takes the form of a wheel segment and features a link track for the valve rod (5) end (6). The track is eccentric and helical in relation to the bearing a axes (10) of the setting part (7) and is equipped with engaging grooves. The bent valve rod (5) and (6) engages in one of the grooves.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 75/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858115A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29710625 U1 19970828; DE 19803811 A1 19981224; DE 19803811 C2 20001005; EP 0990067 A1 20000405; EP 0990067 B1 20020417; ES 2172174 T3 20020916; US 6115949 A 20000912; WO 9858115 A1 19981223

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070604

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070605

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070605

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070604

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070604

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-05 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060605

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060525

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-01 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060301

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-04-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172174 T3

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990924

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT