Global patent index - EP 0990084 A1

EP 0990084 A1 2000-04-05 - CLOSING SYSTEM FOR A SLIDING DOOR

Title (en)

CLOSING SYSTEM FOR A SLIDING DOOR

Title (de)

SCHIEBETÜRSCHLIESSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FERMETURE DE PORTE COULISSANTE

Publication

EP 0990084 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98929410 A

Priority

  • DE 19725357 A
  • DE 29713823 U
  • EP 9803275 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9858147A1] The invention relates to a closing system for a sliding door, wherein the door leaf (4) is suspended using a running gear (6, 7) on a supporting guide rail (8). In order to securely maintain the closed door in a closed position and to facilitate opening of said door, the invention provides that the supporting guide rail (8) has an indent for the running gear when the door leaf (4) is in a closed position. The door leaf (4) can only be moved into said indent when a energy store (11) is loaded and moved out of said indent in the direction of opening when the energy store (11) is unloaded. The direction of force exerted by the energy store (11, 12) substantially corresponds to the direction in which the door leaf (4) is opened, specially when the opening movement begins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 5/08; E05D 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/10 (2006.01); E05D 15/56 (2006.01); E05F 1/08 (2006.01); E05F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/1021 (2013.01); E05D 15/1042 (2013.01); E05D 15/565 (2013.01); E05D 2015/1055 (2013.01); E05F 1/16 (2013.01); E05F 5/003 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/212 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/264 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/426 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/298 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/102 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858147A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DK NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9858147 A1 19981223; AT 208002 T 20011115; DK 0990084 T3 20011217; EP 0990084 A1 20000405; EP 0990084 B1 20011031; HR P980329 A2 19990430; PL 337490 A1 20000828

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20030101

2003-02-17 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2003-02-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030101

2002-10-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-06-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020603

2002-06-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020602

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DK NL SE

2001-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 208002

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DUECK, WILHELM

2000-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: THEOBALD, ALFRED

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991129

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DK NL SE