Global Patent Index - EP 0990088 A1

EP 0990088 A1 2000-04-05 - NOZZLING DEVICE FOR CHISEL BITS AND A METHOD FOR NOZZLING ROUND SHANK CHISEL BITS OF A HOLING MACHINE

Title (en)

NOZZLING DEVICE FOR CHISEL BITS AND A METHOD FOR NOZZLING ROUND SHANK CHISEL BITS OF A HOLING MACHINE

Title (de)

BEDÜSUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR MEISSEL SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM BEDÜSEN DER RUNDSCHAFTMEISSEL EINER SCHRÄMEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR EQUIPER DES PICS AVEC DES BUSES, AINSI QUE PROCEDE POUR EQUIPER AVEC DES BUSES LES PICS A QUEUE CYLINDRIQUE D'UNE HAVEUSE

Publication

EP 0990088 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99908666 A

Priority

  • AT 9900067 W
  • AT 46998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947791A1] The invention relates to a nozzle device for equipping chisel bits (13) of a holing machine in which the chisel bits are configured as round shank chisel bits (13) having a hard material or hard metal insert. The nozzles (19) are oriented in the direction of the cutting path, whereby water is supplied over a part of the rotation of the cutting heads (11) or cutting rollers by means of a sector control. In order to decrease the wear of the hard metal or hard material inserts, the invention provides that the axes (22) of the nozzles (19) are arranged such that they are sloped toward the chisel bit tips (23) and toward the cutting path. In addition, the sector control is adjusted in such a way that the nozzles (19) are actuated with pressurized water over an angle ranging from at least 45 DEG , preferably between 65 DEG and 85 DEG , of the rotation of the cutting head (11) or of the cutting roller after the chisel bit (13) exits the rock. The nozzles (19) are actuated by a pressure exceeding 50 bar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21C 35/187; E21C 35/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21C 35/187 (2006.01); E21C 35/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21C 35/23 (2013.01); E21C 35/187 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947791A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947791 A1 19990923; AU 2818499 A 19991011; DE 59909637 D1 20040708; EP 0990088 A1 20000405; EP 0990088 B1 20040602

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150316

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 268431 T

- Effective date: 20150316

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909637

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140226

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-05-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050303

2004-09-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909637 P 20040708

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT

2004-06-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040602

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991124

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES IT