Global Patent Index - EP 0990093 A1

EP 0990093 A1 2000-04-05 - INDUCTION SYSTEM, ESPECIALLY FOR USE AS AN INDUCTION PORT OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

INDUCTION SYSTEM, ESPECIALLY FOR USE AS AN INDUCTION PORT OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

ANSAUGSYSTEM, INSBESONDERE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS ANSAUGKANAL EINER VERBRENNUNGSKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ASPIRATION, S'UTILISANT NOTAMMENT COMME CANAL D'ASPIRATION D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0990093 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939521 A

Priority

  • DE 19726327 A
  • EP 9803771 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19827410A1] The induction system has an inlet and at least one outlet. At least one internal structure (16) is attached to the inner walls (17) which form a hollow chamber so as to form a resonator chamber in combination with the inner walls. The resonator chamber has at least one opening, esp. a bore (18), towards the inner chamber of the induction system At least one internal structure is arranged in a collection chamber (12) of the induction system. The internal structure consists of a flat part, esp. a holed plate (19), and at least one distance holder (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/12; F02B 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 27/00 (2006.01); F02M 35/10 (2006.01); F02M 35/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10039 (2013.01); F02M 35/10052 (2013.01); F02M 35/1216 (2013.01); F02M 35/1266 (2013.01); F02M 35/10321 (2013.01); F02M 35/1036 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9859166A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT MC SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827410 A1 19990114; BR 9810148 A 20011226; CA 2295004 A1 19981230; DE 59813724 D1 20061026; EP 0990093 A1 20000405; EP 0990093 B1 20060913; JP 2002504974 A 20020212; JP 4089982 B2 20080528; KR 100602747 B1 20060720; KR 20010014012 A 20010226; US 6205968 B1 20010327; WO 9859166 A1 19981230

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59813724

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130619

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130619

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2007-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070614

2007-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061224

2006-12-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-11-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061016

2006-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813724 P 20061026

2006-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT MC SE

2006-09-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060913

2003-12-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANN + HUMMEL GMBH

2000-11-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT MC SE

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT MC SE