Global Patent Index - EP 0990094 A1

EP 0990094 A1 2000-04-05 - STARTING AND DRIVING UNIT FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

STARTING AND DRIVING UNIT FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

START-/ANTRIEBSEINHEIT FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES

Title (fr)

UNITE DE DEMARRAGE ET D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE D'UN VEHICULE

Publication

EP 0990094 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927677 A

Priority

  • DE 9901161 W
  • DE 19817452 A
  • DE 19858992 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6250270B1] The invention relates to a starting/driving unit for an internal combustion engine (VM) of a motor vehicle with at least two starting methods, which has a clutch (K) between the crankshaft (KW), the engine (VM), and the vehicle transmission (FG) as well as an electric machine which is connected to the engine (VM) by way of the clutch (K). With the electric machine, the two starting methods can be executed in an optimal fashion solely by virtue of the fact that through rotation of the crankshaft by means of the electric machine, each starting method is preceded by a start clearing phase in which the starting conditions are detected when the clutch is engaged, a decision is made as to the subsequent operating phases (direct start phase, positioning phase, preinjection phase, impulse start phase) and their starting parameters are determined.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/04; F02N 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/04 (2006.01); F02N 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 5/04 (2013.01); B60L 11/14 (2013.01); B60L 15/20 (2013.01); F02N 11/04 (2013.01); F02N 11/0814 (2013.01); B60L 2240/12 (2013.01); B60L 2240/421 (2013.01); B60L 2240/441 (2013.01); B60L 2240/445 (2013.01); B60L 2240/507 (2013.01); B60L 2260/26 (2013.01); F02N 2300/2002 (2013.01); Y02T 10/48 (2013.01); Y02T 10/645 (2013.01); Y02T 10/70 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7077 (2013.01); Y02T 10/72 (2013.01); Y02T 10/7275 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954620A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6250270 B1 20010626; EP 0990094 A1 20000405; WO 9954620 A1 19991028

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041103

2001-07-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: STARTING METHODS FOR STARTING AND DRIVING UNIT FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001002

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT