Global Patent Index - EP 0990108 B1

EP 0990108 B1 2002-09-18 - TWO STAGED REFRIGERATION CYCLE USING A MULTICONSTITUANT REFRIGERANT

Title (en)

TWO STAGED REFRIGERATION CYCLE USING A MULTICONSTITUANT REFRIGERANT

Title (de)

ZWEISTUFIGES KALTEKREISLAUF MIT MULTIKOMPONENT KALTEMITTEL

Title (fr)

CYCLE DE REFRIGERATION EN DEUX ETAPES UTILISANT UN FRIGORIGENE A PLUSIEURS CONSTITUANTS

Publication

EP 0990108 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98928467 A

Priority

  • GB 9801720 W
  • GB 9712304 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9857108A1] A refrigeration cycle utilizing a multi-component refrigerant wherein the compression of low pressure refrigerant vapour is effected in at least two stages of compression (42, 44) with cooling (48, 58), partial condensation and separation (52, 62) from the uncondensed vapour of the condensate formed after each of at least two of the said stages thereby providing two or more condensate streams (64, 70) of different compositions and at different pressures and wherein at least two of said condensate streams are expanded and injected into the returning low pressure refrigerant (40) at different temperatures of said low pressure refrigerant (40).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/06; F25J 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 1/0262 (2013.01); F25J 1/0022 (2013.01); F25J 1/004 (2013.01); F25J 1/0045 (2013.01); F25J 1/0052 (2013.01); F25J 1/0055 (2013.01); F25J 1/0212 (2013.01); F25J 1/0279 (2013.01); F25J 1/0291 (2013.01); F25J 1/0296 (2013.01); F25J 2200/80 (2013.01); F25J 2205/02 (2013.01); F25J 2215/62 (2013.01); F25J 2220/62 (2013.01); F25J 2220/64 (2013.01); F25J 2290/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9857108 A1 19981217; AU 8029698 A 19981230; DE 69808087 D1 20021024; DE 69808087 T2 20030528; EP 0990108 A1 20000405; EP 0990108 B1 20020918; GB 9712304 D0 19970813

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140612

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140612

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130628

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080428

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808087 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-02-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ISALSKI, WIESLAW, HENRYK

2002-02-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LINNETT, DAVID, THOMAS

2002-02-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LAVIN, JOHN, TERENCE

2002-02-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOUSTEAD, PHILIP

2002-02-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FINN, ADRIAN, JOSEPH

2002-02-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TOMLINSON, TERENCE, RONALD

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010926

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991129

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT