EP 0990132 A4 20000726 - OPTICAL DETECTION OF ENTRAPPED GAS IN A COOLING SYSTEM
Title (en)
OPTICAL DETECTION OF ENTRAPPED GAS IN A COOLING SYSTEM
Title (de)
OPTISCHER NACHWEIS EINES IN EINEM KÜHLSYSTEM EINGESCHLOSSENEN GASES
Title (fr)
DETECTION OPTIQUE D'UN GAZ PIEGE DANS UN SYSTEME DE REFROIDISSEMENT
Publication
Application
Priority
- US 9811793 W 19980605
- US 4879997 P 19970606
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO9855849A1] An optical leak detector (200) for use with a cooling system is described. The optical leak detector includes a light source (203), a light detector (205), and a conversion device (215). The light source is optically coupled to the light detector by way of an optical path (210). The light detector generates an electronic signal in response to light received from the light source. The conversion device, which is attached to the light detector, generates an electronic signal in response to the amount of light received from the light source. This electronic signal can indicate if a leak has occurred in the cooling system by the traversal of a entrapped gas bubble across the optical path formed by the light source and the light detector.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
F25B 49/02 (2006.01); G01M 3/38 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP KR)
G01M 3/38 (2013.01 - EP); G01N 15/00 (2013.01 - KR); G01N 21/00 (2013.01 - KR)
Citation (search report)
- [Y] US 3935876 A 19760203 - MASSIE HAROLD LEE, et al
- [Y] US 5263361 A 19931123 - GATES DONALD C [US]
- [Y] US 5241368 A 19930831 - PONSTINGL MICHAEL J [US], et al
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 168 (P - 212) 23 July 1983 (1983-07-23)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 08 29 August 1997 (1997-08-29)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 125 (E - 1050) 27 March 1991 (1991-03-27)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 006, no. 128 (E - 118) 14 July 1982 (1982-07-14)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 005, no. 185 (P - 091) 25 November 1981 (1981-11-25)
- [AP] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 06 30 April 1998 (1998-04-30)
- See references of WO 9855849A1
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT NL SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 9855849 A1 19981210; AU 741819 B2 20011213; AU 8061298 A 19981221; CA 2292561 A1 19981210; CN 1264469 A 20000823; EP 0990132 A1 20000405; EP 0990132 A4 20000726; JP 2002505003 A 20020212; KR 20010013495 A 20010226; PL 337214 A1 20000814
DOCDB simple family (application)
US 9811793 W 19980605; AU 8061298 A 19980605; CA 2292561 A 19980605; CN 98807307 A 19980605; EP 98928926 A 19980605; JP 50301799 A 19980605; KR 19997011501 A 19991206; PL 33721498 A 19980605