Global Patent Index - EP 0990139 A1

EP 0990139 A1 2000-04-05 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ANALYZING SURFACE STRUCTURE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ANALYZING SURFACE STRUCTURE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR ANALYSE DER BESCHAFFENHEIT EINER OBERFLÄCHE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'ANALYSE DE LA STRUCTURE D'UNE SURFACE

Publication

EP 0990139 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98930805 A

Priority

  • DE 19725633 A
  • EP 9803602 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19725633C1] The invention relates to a method for analyzing surface structure using the images of a camera, wherein at least two images are obtained by illumination of focused and/or diffuse light and individual image data is converted into digital signals, whereupon a computer-assisted three-dimensional representation is generated. The invention also relates to a recording device to implement said method using a video camera (1, 15) and a lighting fixture (16) allocated thereto, wherein the lighting fixture (16) has a first lighting system (D) to produce diffuse light and a second lighting system (G) to produce focused light, in addition to a control device enabling independent electronic control of the first and second lighting systems. The invention further relates to an arrangement to implement the above-mentioned method, comprising the afore-mentioned device, a video recording card to digitize image data generated by the recording device, a data storage unit to store digitized image data, and an evaluation device to generate a computer-assisted three-dimensional image on the basis of the stored image data.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 21/88; G01B 11/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/30 (2006.01); G01N 21/88 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01B 11/30 (2013.01); G01N 21/8806 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858242A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19725633 C1 19981217; AU 753746 B2 20021024; AU 8111298 A 19990104; EP 0990139 A1 20000405; US 6907138 B1 20050614; WO 9858242 A1 19981223

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-09 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-09-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VIISAGE TECHNOLOGY AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZN VISION TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020826

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991221

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE