Global patent index - EP 0990163 A1

EP 0990163 A1 2000-04-05 - Die carrier with balance block for uniform force delivery to the die

Title (en)

Die carrier with balance block for uniform force delivery to the die

Title (de)

Chipträger mit Ausgleichskörper zur gleichmässiger Kraftabgabe an den Chip

Title (fr)

Support de puce avec bloc balancier pour application uniforme de la force sur la puce

Publication

EP 0990163 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97924660 A

Priority

  • US 9707940 W
  • US 64534396 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9743658A1] A reusable carrier (10) for temporarily holding an integrated circuit (12) during burn-in and electrical test includes a base (14) and a lid (16) attached to the base (14) by hinges (18). A flexible substrate (19) is attached to the base (14). Alignment posts (20) have tapered surfaces (22) that engage corners (24) of the integrated circuit (12) to position the integrated circuit (12) precisely on upper surface (26) of the substrate (19). A spring-loaded latch (28) engages projection (30) in aperture (32) of the base (14) to hold the lid (16) closed over the integrated circuit (12). Electrically conductive traces (34) on the surface (26) have contact bumps which engage contact pads on the underside of the integrated circuit (12) to connect the integrated circuit (12) to peripheral contact pads (38) around edges (40) of the substrate (19). A spring (42) engages upper surface (43) of the integrated circuit (12) when the lid (16) is in its closed position over the integrated circuit (12), to provide a biasing force to urge the contact pads against the conductive traces (34).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01R 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/673 (2006.01); G01R 1/04 (2006.01); G01R 31/02 (2006.01); G01R 31/26 (2006.01); H01L 21/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01R 1/0483 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IE IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9743658 A1 19971120; CN 1107232 C 20030430; CN 1222976 A 19990714; EP 0990163 A1 20000405; EP 0990163 A4 20000405; JP 2000511632 A 20000905; JP 3928979 B2 20070613; KR 20000010928 A 20000225

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050621

2005-03-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DIE CARRIER WITH BALANCE BLOCK FOR UNIFORM FORCE DELIVERY TO THE DIE

2004-05-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 01R 1/04 A

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021004

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981210

2000-04-05 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000203

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE IT NL PT

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE IT NL PT