Global patent index - EP 0990191 A1

EP 0990191 A1 2000-04-05 - CONTACT LENS

Title (en)

CONTACT LENS

Title (de)

KONTAKTLINSE

Title (fr)

VERRES DE CONTACT

Publication

EP 0990191 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97916258 A

Priority

  • US 9705279 W
  • US 61841296 A
  • US 77747096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9734185A1] A contact lens for use with an asymmetric aspherical cornea. The lens includes an anterior surface, a posterior surface and a base. The posterior and anterior surfaces each include a center optical portion (36) and an outer peripheral corneal portion (34). The posterior surface is divided into a plurality of local surface segments (66) by a plurality of radially extending boundaries that originate from a common center point on the posterior surface of the lens. Each of the local surface segments (66) conforms to the shape of a corresponding local surface portion of the cornea that lies under the respective lens local surface segment when the lens is worn on the eye.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02C 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02C 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02C 7/047 (2013.01); G02C 7/041 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9734185 A1 19970918; AU 2348397 A 19971001; AU 731311 B2 20010329; BR 9708072 A 19990727; EP 0990191 A1 20000405; EP 0990191 A4 20060215; IL 126219 A 20030312; IL 126219 D0 19990509; JP 2001502810 A 20010227; NO 984246 A 19981116; NO 984246 D0 19980914; NZ 332017 A 20000623; NZ 504006 A 20020201; PL 184804 B1 20021231; PL 185924 B1 20030829; PL 328802 A1 19990215

INPADOC legal status

2009-11-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090526

2009-02-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20090115

2006-02-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-11-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 02C 7/04 A

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980929

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE