Global Patent Index - EP 0990199 A1

EP 0990199 A1 2000-04-05 - REGULATING DEVICE

Title (en)

REGULATING DEVICE

Title (de)

REGLERVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REGLAGE

Publication

EP 0990199 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98934784 A

Priority

  • DE 9801420 W
  • DE 19725841 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9858302A1] The invention relates to a regulating device, comprising a first controllable semiconductor component (3) with an input terminal (4) connected to the regulator input (1), an output terminal (5) connected to the regulator output (2) and a control terminal (6); a second semiconductor component (20) connected to the control terminal (6) of the first semiconductor component (3), which second component has an input terminal (21), an output terminal (23) and a control terminal (22); a comparator device (25) having a first input (27), a second input (28) and an output (26) connected to the control terminal (22) of the second semiconductor element (20), whereby a reference voltage (Vref) can be fed to the first input (27) and the second input (28) is connected to the regulator output (2); and a driver device (40), which partly diverts the current from the control terminal (6) of the first semiconductor component (3) to the regulator output (2) by means of an input signal emitted at the level of the regulator input (1) when a predefined limit value (Vg) is exceeded.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 1/565; G05F 1/575

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/565 (2006.01); G05F 1/575 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/565 (2013.01); G05F 1/575 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858302A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9858302 A1 19981223; EP 0990199 A1 20000405; EP 0990199 B1 20011107; JP 2002501648 A 20020115; JP 3425961 B2 20030714

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160714

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-03-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-01-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-05-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040525

2004-05-25 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040525

2003-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030430

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030428

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020115

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802077 20011213

2001-12-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010226

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991206

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT