Global Patent Index - EP 0990228 A1

EP 0990228 A1 2000-04-05 - VISUAL DISPLAY SYSTEMS

Title (en)

VISUAL DISPLAY SYSTEMS

Title (de)

AUZEIGESYSTEME

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE

Publication

EP 0990228 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98930895 A

Priority

  • GB 9801794 W
  • GB 9713035 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2295768A1] A bicycle wheel (4) is supported by a fork (6) to which a magnet (12) is attached. Attached to one spoke (8) of the wheel (4) is an elongate array (10) comprising sixteen light emitting diodes extending radially of the wheel (4). A controller (16), mounted on the spoke (8) is connected to the array (10) by a cable (18). The controller includes a memory that stores a program for controlling the sequence in which the different LEDs of the array are to be energised. By selecting the timing and energisation of the different LEDs in accordance with a predetermined program, the observer will see an apparently stationary image on the wheel notwithstanding that it is rotating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 21/04; G09F 9/33

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/33 (2006.01); G09F 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/005 (2013.01); G09F 9/33 (2013.01); G09F 21/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9859333A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2326513 A 19981223; GB 2326513 B 20011205; GB 9813219 D0 19980819; AT 229215 T 20021215; AU 8117698 A 19990104; CA 2295768 A1 19981230; CA 2295768 C 20061205; DE 69809910 D1 20030116; DE 69809910 T2 20030904; EP 0990228 A1 20000405; EP 0990228 B1 20021204; ES 2189193 T3 20030701; GB 9713035 D0 19970827; WO 9859333 A1 19981230

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-05-27 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: SPECTRUM MOTION MEDIA LTD.

- Effective date: 20110517

2011-02-02 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110120

2010-11-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-11-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091022 AND 20091028

2009-11-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091015 AND 20091021

2003-11-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030905

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189193 T3

2003-03-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-01-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809910 20030116

2002-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229215 T 20021215

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARGETSON, GUY, EDWARD, JOHN

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HEDGES, THOMAS, ANDREW

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WYATT, ROY

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991229

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE