Global patent index - EP 0990237 A1

EP 0990237 A1 2000-04-05 - CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CONTAINER

Title (en)

CONTAINER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A CONTAINER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BEHÄLTERS SOWIE EIN BEHÄLTER SELBST

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN CONTENEUR, ET CONTENEUR AINSI PRODUIT

Publication

EP 0990237 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936155 A

Priority

  • DE 9801608 W
  • DE 19725922 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19725922A1] The invention relates to a method for producing a container designed to transport and store radioactive material. The invention further relates to a container which is used to transport and store radioactive material. First and foremost, claim is laid to the selection of a heavy concrete and a special technique for inserting the heavy concrete between metall walls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21F 5/00 (2006.01); G21F 5/008 (2006.01); G21F 9/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21F 5/00 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/10 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/207 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/303 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/305 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/306 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/10 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9859346A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19725922 A1 19981224; DE 19725922 C2 20000720; AU 8531398 A 19990104; CA 2292589 A1 19981230; CA 2292589 C 20030225; CN 1165915 C 20040908; CN 1261456 A 20000726; CZ 293385 B6 20040414; CZ 9904338 A3 20000412; EA 001461 B1 20010423; EP 0990237 A1 20000405; EP 0990237 B1 20020807; ES 2181250 T3 20030216; JP 2001508874 A 20010703; SK 175199 A3 20000612; SK 283640 B6 20031104; US 6518585 B1 20030211; WO 9859346 A1 19981230

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: GACHNANG AG PATENTANWAELTE, CH

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: G.- FUR NUKLEAR-BEHALTER M.B.H. *GNB

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050630

2006-04-07 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050609

2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-12-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2005-06-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GNS GESELLSCHAFT FUER NUKLEAR-SERVICE MBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050609

2004-06-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040623

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040617

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040527

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2181250

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HANS RUDOLF GACHNANG PATENTANWALT

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805117

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-12

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-08-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19991106

2002-08-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: GNB GESELLSCHAFT FUER NUKLEAR-BEHAELTER MBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GNB GESELLSCHAFT FUER NUKLEARBEHAELTER MBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010629

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991106

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19991106