Global Patent Index - EP 0990243 A1

EP 0990243 A1 2000-04-05 - SNAP-ON WAFER SWITCH WITH A FIXING ELEMENT

Title (en)

SNAP-ON WAFER SWITCH WITH A FIXING ELEMENT

Title (de)

SCHNAPPSCHEIBENSCHALTER MIT BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT

Title (fr)

INTERRUPTEUR SENSIBLE AVEC ELEMENT DE FIXATION

Publication

EP 0990243 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99926274 A

Priority

  • DE 9901194 W
  • DE 19823894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954900A1] The invention relates to a snap-on wafer switch with a curved snap-on wafer (1) having locating elements (2, 3, 4, 5) by means of which the wafer can be supported on a base element. At least one locating element (2) has a fixing element (7) by means of which the snap-on wafer (1) can be fixed on the base element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 5/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 5/30 (2013.01); H01H 2207/032 (2013.01); H01H 2227/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954900A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954900 A1 19991028; DE 19823894 C1 20000105; EP 0990243 A1 20000405; EP 0990243 B1 20020911

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160308

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59902636

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE DIMMERLING & HUWER, DE

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DAV, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PRYM INOVAN GMBH & CO. KG, DAV, , FR

- Document: DE 59902636

- Effective date: 20120823

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INOVAN GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PRYM INOVAN GMBH & CO. KG, DAV, , FR

- Document: DE 59902636

- Effective date: 20120823

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INOVAN GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: PRYM INOVAN GMBH & CO. KG, 52224 STOLBERG, DE; DAV, MONTIGNY LE BRETONNEUX, FR

- Document: DE 59902636

- Effective date: 20120823

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DAV, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: PRYM INOVAN GMBH & CO. KG, 52224 STOLBERG, DE; DAV, MONTIGNY LE BRETONNEUX, FR

- Document: DE 59902636

- Effective date: 20120823

2012-10-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59902636

- Representative's name: HEINZ DIMMERLING, DE

- Effective date: 20120823

2012-10-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59902636

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE DIMMERLING & HUWER, DE

- Effective date: 20120823

2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-12-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902636 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010618

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991228

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE