Global Patent Index - EP 0990244 A1

EP 0990244 A1 2000-04-05 - SNAP-ON WAFER SWITCH

Title (en)

SNAP-ON WAFER SWITCH

Title (de)

SCHNAPPSCHEIBENSCHALTER

Title (fr)

INTERRUPTEUR SENSIBLE

Publication

EP 0990244 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927695 A

Priority

  • DE 9901193 W
  • DE 19816946 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9954899A1] The invention relates to a snap-on wafer switch (1) having bead (2) arranged at the highest point of an arch. A separate contact element (3) is fixed in the bead (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 5/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 5/30 (2013.01); H01H 2227/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9954899A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9954899 A1 19991028; DE 19816946 C1 20000309; EP 0990244 A1 20000405; EP 0990244 B1 20021120; ES 2203149 T3 20040401

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160308

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59903456

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE DIMMERLING & HUWER, DE

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DAV, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PRYM INOVAN GMBH & CO. KG, DAV, , FR

- Document: DE 59903456

- Effective date: 20120823

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INOVAN GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PRYM INOVAN GMBH & CO. KG, DAV, , FR

- Document: DE 59903456

- Effective date: 20120823

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: INOVAN GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: PRYM INOVAN GMBH & CO. KG, 52224 STOLBERG, DE; DAV, MONTIGNY LE BRETONNEUX, FR

- Document: DE 59903456

- Effective date: 20120823

2012-10-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DAV, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: PRYM INOVAN GMBH & CO. KG, 52224 STOLBERG, DE; DAV, MONTIGNY LE BRETONNEUX, FR

- Document: DE 59903456

- Effective date: 20120823

2012-10-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59903456

- Representative's name: HEINZ DIMMERLING, DE

- Effective date: 20120823

2012-10-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59903456

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE DIMMERLING & HUWER, DE

- Effective date: 20120823

2005-04-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050417

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030419

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2203149 T3

2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030417

2003-12-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030419

2003-04-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030418

2003-04-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030417

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903456 20030102

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010615

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991228

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE