Global Patent Index - EP 0990311 A1

EP 0990311 A1 2000-04-05 - ACTIVATION OF MULTIPLE xDSL MODEMS WITH IMPLICIT CHANNEL PROBE

Title (en)

ACTIVATION OF MULTIPLE xDSL MODEMS WITH IMPLICIT CHANNEL PROBE

Title (de)

AKTIVIERUNG VON MEHREREN xDSL-MODEMS MIT IMPLIZITEN KANAL PROBE

Title (fr)

ACTIVATION DE MULTIPLES MODEMS xDSL AU MOYEN D'UNE SONDE DE CANAL IMPLICITE

Publication

EP 0990311 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99914300 A

Priority

  • US 9906986 W
  • US 8031098 P
  • US 8985098 P
  • US 9366998 P
  • US 9447998 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9950967A1] Apparatus and method for establishing a communication link. A negotiation data transmitting section (54) transmits carriers to a responding communication device (4). A negotiation data receiving section (54) receives carriers from the responding communication device (4), in response to the transmitted carriers. A selecting device selects an appropriate communication device from a plurality of communication devices in accordance with the responding communication device (4), in order to establish a communication channel (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 1/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 29/08 (2006.01); H04J 1/00 (2006.01); H04L 1/00 (2006.01); H04L 1/24 (2006.01); H04L 5/14 (2006.01); H04L 12/12 (2006.01); H04L 12/66 (2006.01); H04L 27/26 (2006.01); H04L 29/02 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04M 11/00 (2006.01); H04M 11/06 (2006.01); H04L 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 5/0044 (2013.01); H04L 1/0001 (2013.01); H04L 1/0026 (2013.01); H04L 1/24 (2013.01); H04L 5/143 (2013.01); H04L 5/1446 (2013.01); H04L 5/1453 (2013.01); H04L 27/2602 (2013.01); H04L 27/2608 (2013.01); H04L 27/2614 (2013.01); H04L 1/18 (2013.01); H04L 5/0007 (2013.01); Y02D 50/10 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9950967 A1 19991007; AU 3218199 A 19991018; CA 2288283 A1 19991007; CA 2288283 C 20070612; CA 2396963 A1 19991007; CA 2396963 C 20061010; CA 2398865 A1 19991007; CA 2398865 C 20060502; CA 2407503 A1 19991007; CA 2407503 C 20060829; CA 2417991 A1 19991007; CA 2417991 C 20060801; CA 2445332 A1 19991007; CA 2445332 C 20080108; CA 2445334 A1 19991007; CA 2445334 C 20080805; CN 100340067 C 20070926; CN 100517991 C 20090722; CN 100530986 C 20090819; CN 1266558 A 20000913; CN 1293705 C 20070103; CN 1312848 C 20070425; CN 1327629 C 20070718; CN 1327630 C 20070718; CN 1492592 A 20040428; CN 1492593 A 20040428; CN 1501591 A 20040602; CN 1507165 A 20040623; CN 1507166 A 20040623; CN 1527488 A 20040908; EP 0990311 A1 20000405; EP 0990311 A4 20031210; EP 1341337 A2 20030903; EP 1341337 A3 20031210; EP 1341338 A2 20030903; EP 1341338 A3 20040102; EP 1341339 A2 20030903; EP 1341339 A3 20040102; EP 1341340 A2 20030903; EP 1341340 A3 20040102; EP 1398898 A1 20040317; EP 1414180 A2 20040428; EP 1414180 A3 20040506; EP 3236612 A1 20171025; JP 2002247138 A 20020830; JP 2002500855 A 20020108; JP 2004048681 A 20040212; JP 2004048785 A 20040212; JP 2004112821 A 20040408; JP 3441081 B2 20030825; JP 3488234 B1 20040119; JP 3502092 B1 20040302; JP 3715289 B2 20051109; JP 4195558 B2 20081210; KR 100422755 B1 20040312; KR 100431692 B1 20040517; KR 100431693 B1 20040517; KR 100431695 B1 20040517; KR 100441921 B1 20040730; KR 100514052 B1 20050913; KR 100514057 B1 20050913; KR 20030055348 A 20030702; KR 20030059343 A 20030707; KR 20030059344 A 20030707; KR 20030059345 A 20030707; KR 20040010851 A 20040131; KR 20040013147 A 20040211; KR 20040013148 A 20040211; KR 20040015361 A 20040218; KR 20040015362 A 20040218; SG 123553 A1 20060726; SG 123554 A1 20060726; TW 439369 B 20010607

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20120802

2012-08-02 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2010-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PANASONIC SYSTEM NETWORKS CO., LTD.

2009-03-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PANASONIC COMMUNICATIONS CO., LTD.

2005-05-11 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000315

2003-12-10 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20031028

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 5/14 A

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 29/06 B

2000-05-24 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL