Global patent index - EP 0990369 A2

EP 0990369 A2 2000-04-05 - SOUND REPRODUCTION SYSTEM

Title (en)

SOUND REPRODUCTION SYSTEM

Title (de)

TONWIEDERGABESYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE REPRODUCTION DE SONS

Publication

EP 0990369 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98924440 A

Priority

  • EP 98924440 A
  • EP 97304310 A
  • GB 9801527 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9858522A2] A method of sound reproduction for reproducing sound by way of a plurality of loudspeakers comprises the steps of determining wherein a defined space a virtual sound source is located and, for a particular virtual sound source, applying a cross talk cancellation process to a sub-set of the loudspeakers, said sub-set being selected on the basis of the location of the virtual sound source in the defined space.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04S 3/00; H04R 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/12 (2006.01); H04S 1/00 (2006.01); H04S 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04S 3/00 (2013.01); H04R 3/12 (2013.01); H04S 2400/01 (2013.01); H04S 2420/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9858522A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FI FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9858522 A2 19981223; WO 9858522 A3 19990311; AU 735233 B2 20010705; AU 7664498 A 19990104; DE 69816298 D1 20030814; DE 69816298 T2 20040527; EP 0990369 A2 20000405; EP 0990369 B1 20030709; JP 2002505057 A 20020212

INPADOC legal status

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090527

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090527

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080425

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080414

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080425

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070411

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070412

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060412

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060411

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-10-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69816298

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR GB NL

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-07-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030709

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991213

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR GB NL