Global Patent Index - EP 0990402 A2

EP 0990402 A2 2000-04-05 - Portable electric cleaning device

Title (en)

Portable electric cleaning device

Title (de)

Tragbares elektrisches Reinigungswerkzeug

Title (fr)

Appareil électrique portatif de nettoyage

Publication

EP 0990402 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99116126 A

Priority

US 16332498 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a portable electric cleaning device (10, 100, 200) for cleaning various household items. The cleaning device (10, 100, 200) comprises a housing (20), a motor (30), a cleaning module (50, 120), and a battery set (60). The housing (20) has a handle (22, 130, 230) and a chassis (24, 110, 210). The motor (30) is installed in the chassis (24, 110, 210) of the housing (20) and comprises a rotating axle (32, 38). The cleaning module (50, 120) has a cleaning head (54, 300, 400, 500, 600, 700, 800, 900, 1000) for cleaning various home appliances and home environments, and a connecting end (52) installed on the rotating axle (32, 38). The battery set (60) is installed in the housing (20) for driving the motor (30) so as to rotate the cleaning module (50, 120). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 13/00; A46B 13/02; B08B 1/04; B24B 45/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 13/02 (2006.01); B24B 45/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 13/02 (2013.01); B24B 45/006 (2013.01); B65H 2404/271 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990402 A2 20000405; EP 0990402 A3 20030924

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20040713

2004-06-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-10-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEK MAKER CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020712

2000-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TECH MAKER CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LO, TEH-LIANG

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI