Global Patent Index - EP 0990413 A1

EP 0990413 A1 2000-04-05 - A method of filtering the washing and/or rinsing liquid in a dishwasher and apparatus for implementing the method

Title (en)

A method of filtering the washing and/or rinsing liquid in a dishwasher and apparatus for implementing the method

Title (de)

Verfahren und vorrichtung zum Filtrieren von Wasch- und/oder Spülflüssigkeit in einer Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour filtrer le liquide de lavage et/ou de rinçage dans un lave vaisselle

Publication

EP 0990413 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830569 A

Priority

EP 98830569 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a method of filtering the washing liquid in a dishwasher comprising a tank (1) for holding the items to be washed, in which the flow of washing liquid is drawn from the tank by a main recirculation pump (25) drawing from the bottom (9) of the tank (1) and is admitted to the tank through a plurality of spray nozzles (6) for a predetermined period of time, the flow being passed through a circuit comprising a primary screen (10) disposed in the bottom (9) of the tank and a perforated basket (11) for retaining the large particles of dirt removed from the items to be washed, as well as through a chamber (14) disposed beneath the primary screen (10), at least partially surrounding the perforated basket (11), and having filtering elements (16) for retaining fine dirt particles. The method includes a step in which a portion of the flow of washing liquid is drawn off by means of a suitable auxiliary pump (29) at a point of the circuit downstream of the filtering elements (16) for retaining the fine particles, the portion of washing liquid drawn off is sent to an additional filtering member (34) and, after filtration, the portion is returned to the flow of washing liquid. The method thus achieves the result of an ability to perform washing and rinsing cycles in a dishwasher with circulating liquids which are substantially free of dirt particles in suspension. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/4208 (2013.01); A47L 15/4206 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990413 A1 20000405; EP 0990413 B1 20031217; DE 69820625 D1 20040129; DE 69820625 T2 20041111

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090929

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080911

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-10-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69820625 P 20040129

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011217

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI