Global Patent Index - EP 0990414 A2

EP 0990414 A2 2000-04-05 - Use of a method to improve the properties of a plastic material by fluorination or plasma treatment

Title (en)

Use of a method to improve the properties of a plastic material by fluorination or plasma treatment

Title (de)

Anwendung des Verfahrens, Werkstoffe aus Kunststoff durch Fluorierung oder Plasma-Behandlung in ihren Eigenschaften zu verbessern

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'un procédé pour améliorer les propriétés d'une matière plastique par fluoration ou traitement de plasma

Publication

EP 0990414 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115653 A

Priority

DE 19842095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19842095A1] Plastic parts coming into direct contact with dishwashing- or clothes washing liquors are fluorinated or plasma-treated. This improves their crosslinking characteristics.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft die Anwendung des Verfahrens, Werkstoffe aus Kunststoff durch nachträgliche Aktivierung ihrer Oberflächen mittels Fluorierung oder Plasma-Behandlung in ihren Benetzungseigenschaften zu verbessern. Das Verfahren soll eingesetzt werden bei Kunststoffteilen von Geschirrspülmaschinen oder Waschmaschinen, die mit der Spül- oder Reinigungsflüssigkeit direkt beaufschlagt sind. Nach diesem Verfahren werden vollständig aus einem polymeren Werkstoff, wie Polypropylen, Polyethylen, deren Copolymerisate, Polyamid oder aus einem Regenerat dieser Kunststoffe gefertigte oder mit diesem Kunststoff überzogene und in den Spülwasserkreislauf einbezogene Bauteile behandelt. Durch diese Behandlung wird ohne zusätzliche konstruktive Maßnahmen eine wesentliche Verbesserung des Abtropfverhaltens an den Spülgutträgern, wie Besteckschubladen, Geschirrkörben usw. erreicht und eine durch lipophile Lebensmittelfarbstoffe bewirkte Verfärbung der Bauteile kann nicht mehr auftreten.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/42; D06F 37/02; D06F 37/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/42 (2006.01); A47L 15/50 (2006.01); D06F 37/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/261 (2013.01); A47L 15/42 (2013.01); A47L 15/48 (2013.01); A47L 15/50 (2013.01); D06F 37/26 (2013.01); D06F 37/262 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19842095 A1 20000316; EP 0990414 A2 20000405; EP 0990414 A3 20020123

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050301

2003-07-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MIELE & CIE. KG

2002-10-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020709

2002-01-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI