Global patent index - EP 0990454 A2

EP 0990454 A2 2000-04-05 - Skate

Title (en)

Skate

Title (de)

Rollschuh

Title (fr)

Patin à roulettes

Publication

EP 0990454 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99116806 A

Priority

IT TV980039 U

Abstract (en)

A skate constituted by a frame (5) detachably connected to a soft shoe (2). The frame (5) is divided into a first frame portion (7) and a second frame portion (12) which are mutually articulated so as to allow to perform optimum skating and to use the shoe for normal walking. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/06 (2006.01); A63C 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/062 (2013.01); A63C 17/065 (2013.01); A63C 17/20 (2013.01); A63C 17/262 (2013.01); A63C 2017/0053 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

TV TV98U000039 U

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990454 A2 20000405; EP 0990454 A3 20010919; CA 2284046 A1 20000330; IT 245533 Y1 20020322; IT TV980039 U1 20000330

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 63C 17/06 A, 7A 63C 1/28 B

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI