Global Patent Index - EP 0990456 A1

EP 0990456 A1 2000-04-05 - In- line skate with lighting assembly

Title (en)

In- line skate with lighting assembly

Title (de)

Inline-Skater mit Beleuchtungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Patin à roulettes en ligne avec dispositif d'éclairage

Publication

EP 0990456 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98119038 A

Priority

DE 29817480 U

Abstract (en)

The in-line roller skate has an electrically operated light source (4) for illuminating the path in front of the roller skate and/or an electrically operated light source (5) for illuminating the area behind the roller skate. The operating supply for the light source is provided by one or more batteries, positioned between the boot (2) and the rollers (3) of the skate. An Independent claim for an illumination device for an in-line roller skate is also included.

Abstract (de)

Inline-Skater mit Beleuchtungseinrichtung sowie eine nachrüstbare Beleuchtungseinrichtung für Inline-Skater, umfassend eine elektrisch betriebene Leuchtquelle die in Fahrtrichtung zur Beleuchtung der Fahrtstrecke abstrahlt und/oder eine elektrisch betriebene Leuchtquelle die in den rückwärtigen Bereich abstrahlt sowie eine Spannungsquelle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 17/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/26 (2013.01); A63C 17/06 (2013.01); A63C 2203/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990456 A1 20000405

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-14 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030207

2002-09-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WERNER LANGER GMBH & CO. METALL- UND KUNSTSTOFFVER

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEBAUER, KLAUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WERNER LANGER GMBH & CO. METALL- UND KUNSTSTOFFVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GEBAUER, KLAUS

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI