Global Patent Index - EP 0990464 A1

EP 0990464 A1 2000-04-05 - Jet pump for compression of a two phase mixture by means of supersonic flow

Title (en)

Jet pump for compression of a two phase mixture by means of supersonic flow

Title (de)

Strahlpumpe zur Kompression eines zweiphasigen Gemisches mittels Überschallströmung

Title (fr)

Pompe à jet pour la compression d'un mélange biphasé par écoulement supersonique

Publication

EP 0990464 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810976 A

Priority

EP 98810976 A

Abstract (en)

The process comprises forming a foam (21) from the gas and a liquid, where the speed of sound is smaller than the in gas and in the liquid ; directing the foam at supersonic speed through a nozzle (19,20) so condensing the gas; and separating the condensed gas and liquid from one another after the nozzle (19,20). An Independent claim is included for a condensing apparatus (10).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum komprimieren eines Gases wird eine einfach zu realisierende Kompression dadurch erreicht, dass in einem ersten Schritt aus dem Gas und einer Flüssigkeit ein Schaum (21) gebildet wird, in welchem die Schallgeschwindigkeit deutlich kleiner ist als in dem Gas und in der Flüssigkeit für sich genommen, dass in einem zweiten Schritt der Schaum mit Ueberschallgeschwindigkeit durch eine Düse (19, 20) geleitet und dadurch das im Schaum befindliche Gas komprimiert wird, und dass in einem dritten Schritt hinter der Düse (19, 20) das komprimierte Gas und die Flüssigkeit voneinander getrennt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 5/04; F04F 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/04 (2006.01); F04F 5/06 (2006.01); B01F 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04F 5/06 (2013.01); B01F 5/0406 (2013.01); B01F 5/041 (2013.01); B01F 5/0416 (2013.01); B01F 2013/1052 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5083429 A 19920128 - VERES GERGELY [HU], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990464 A1 20000405; EP 0990464 B1 20030312; AT 234144 T 20030315; DE 59807474 D1 20030417; US 6241479 B1 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59807474

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120928

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130403

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120928

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120928

2013-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 234144 T

- Effective date: 20120928

2013-04-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120929

2013-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110825

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110909

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110826

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110901

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100930

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-10-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-06-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ABREMA AGENCE BREVETS ET MARQUES GANGUILLET & HUMP

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807474 P 20030417

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI SE

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI SE

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI