Global Patent Index - EP 0990469 A2

EP 0990469 A2 2000-04-05 - Cold rolling machine for profiling

Title (en)

Cold rolling machine for profiling

Title (de)

Kaltwalzprofiliermaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à laminer à froid pour profiler

Publication

EP 0990469 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112128 A

Priority

DE 29817498 U

Abstract (en)

There are at least two rows of profile tool carrier shafts (12) mounted one after another in the workpiece feed direction on the machine frame (10).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Kaltwalzprofiliermaschine zur Herstellung von profilierten Werkstücken, mit in Vorschubrichtung eines Werkstückes hintereinander angeordneten Werkzeugträgerwellen (12) zur Aufnahme von Profilierwerkzeugen, mit wenigstens einer Antriebseinheit, mittels derer die Werkzeugträgerwellen (12) antreibbar sind, sowie mit einem Maschinengestell (10), auf dem die Werkzeugträgerwellen (12) montiert sind. Erfindungsgemäß sind auf dem Maschinengestell (10) wenigstens zwei Reihen von in Vorschubrichtung eines Werkstückes hintereinander angeordneten Werkzeugträgerwellen (12) angeordnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 31/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/08 (2006.01); B21D 5/08 (2006.01); B21B 13/02 (2006.01); B21B 31/06 (2006.01); B21B 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/08 (2013.01); B21D 5/08 (2013.01); B21B 13/02 (2013.01); B21B 31/06 (2013.01); B21B 35/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29817498 U1 19990218; EP 0990469 A2 20000405; EP 0990469 A3 20020605

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030411

2003-03-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-02-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21B 31/08 A, 7B 21D 5/08 B

2002-05-22 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: JENSEN A/S

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI