Global patent index - EP 0990471 A1

EP 0990471 A1 2000-04-05 - Bending machine

Title (en)

Bending machine

Title (de)

Biegemaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à plier

Publication

EP 0990471 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830579 A

Priority

EP 98830579 A

Abstract (en)

It is described a tube bending machine having a supporting frame (2) on which a tube to be bent (4) is disposed. Right and left forming dies (7, 8) act on the tube (4). A bending tool (9) moved by a rocking arm (21) carries out bending of the tube around the forming dies. The bending tool (9) is also radially movable close to and away from the forming dies, to perform a controlled and precise tube bending. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 7/02; B21D 7/022; B21D 11/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 7/02 (2006.01); B21D 7/022 (2006.01); B21D 7/12 (2006.01); B21D 11/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 11/07 (2013.01); B21D 7/021 (2013.01); B21D 7/022 (2013.01); B21D 7/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990471 A1 20000405

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030110

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020830

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000826

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI