Global patent index - EP 0990474 A1

EP 0990474 A1 2000-04-05 - Inert gas shrouding device for moulds for the continuous casting of metals

Title (en)

Inert gas shrouding device for moulds for the continuous casting of metals

Title (de)

Inertgasabschirmvorrichtung für Kokillen zum Stranggiessen von Metall

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'inertage pour lingotière de coulée continue des métaux

Publication

EP 0990474 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402209 A

Priority

FR 9812128 A

Abstract (en)

Continuous steel casting device, comprises a blanketing device having a ring shaped inflatable membrane made of a gas permeable material in order to protect the surface of the molten metal. Blanketing device of the gap (27) surrounding the free surface (17) of the liquid metal (2) which is continuously cast in an ingot mould (6) positioned under an adaptor (1) having a cast gate (5) of liquid metal (2) feeding the ingot mould, comprises a ring-shaped inflatable membrane (19) made of a gas permeable material. The thickness of the membrane (when inflated) is superior to the maximal distance between the top flange (26) of the ingot mould and the bottom (3) of the adaptor during casting. A tubular armature (20) is positioned inside the membrane and is provided with at least one intake manifold (21,22) for an inert gas. The device also comprises outlets (23,24) for releasing the gas into the membrane, fixing elements (25) for fixing the membrane on the bottom (3) of the adaptor or on the top flange (26) of the ingot mold, the membrane surrounding the casting gate, inflating means to inflate the membrane and to keep it inflated and in seal contact with the bottom of the adaptor and the top flange of the ingot mold.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif d'inertage de l'espace (27) environnant la surface libre (17) du métal liquide (2) coulé dans une lingotière (6) de coulée continue des métaux située sous un répartiteur (1), à partir duquel s'écoule un jet de coulée (5) de métal liquide (2) alimentant la lingotière (6), caractérisé en ce qu'il comporte une membrane annulaire gonflable (19) réalisée en un matériau souple perméable aux gaz et dont l'épaisseur, à l'état gonflé, est supérieure à la distance maximale séparant le rebord supérieur (26) de la lingotière (6) et le fond (3) du répartiteur (1) pendant la coulée, une armature tubulaire (20) logée à l'intérieur de ladite membrane (19) et pourvue d'au moins une tubulure (21, 22) d'amenée d'un gaz d'inertage dans son intérieur et d'orifices de sortie (23, 24) par lesquels ledit gaz s'échappe à l'intérieur de ladite membrane (19), des moyens (25) de fixation de la membrane (19) sur le fond (3) du répartiteur (1) ou sur le rebord supérieur (26) de la lingotière (6) dans une position telle qu'elle entoure le jet de coulée (5), et des moyens d'insufflation dudit gaz d'inertage dans ladite tubulure (21, 22) permettant d'assurer le gonflage de la membrane (19) et de la maintenir à l'état comprimé en contact étanche et simultané avec le fond (3) du répartiteur (1) et le rebord supérieur (26) de la lingotière (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/04 (2006.01); B22D 11/106 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990474 A1 20000405; EP 0990474 B1 20031217; AT 256517 T 20040115; BR 9904398 A 20001226; CA 2284375 A1 20000328; DE 69913631 D1 20040129; DE 69913631 T2 20041223; ES 2213337 T3 20040816; FR 2783732 A1 20000331; FR 2783732 B1 20001027; JP 2000176614 A 20000627; KR 20000023354 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040517

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *ASCOMETAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *UGINE-SAVOIE IMPHY

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOLLAC

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. DES *FORGES ET ACIERIES DE DILLING

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040910

2005-09-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-05-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040909

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *ASCOMETAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *UGINE-SAVOIE IMPHY

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOLLAC

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. DES *FORGES ET ACIERIES DE DILLING

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-09-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-09-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-09-09 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-09-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-09-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2213337

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-07-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SOCIETE ANONYME DES FORGES ET ACIERIES DE DILLING

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2004-07-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SOLLAC

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2004-07-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: UGINE-SAVOIE IMPHY

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2004-07-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: UGINE-SAVOIE IMPHY EN SOLLAC EN SOCIETE ANONYME DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2004-06-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-04-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2004-04-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ASCOMETAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-04-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: UGINE-SAVOIE IMPHY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-04-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SOLLAC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-04-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SOCIETE ANONYME DES FORGES ET ACIERIES DE DILLING

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-03-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-03-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69913631

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2003-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-17 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASCOMETAL (SOCIETE ANONYME)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UGINE-SAVOIE IMPHY

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOLLAC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOCIETE ANONYME DES FORGES ET ACIERIES DE DILLING

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PERRIN, ERIC

2000-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SALARIS, COSIMO

2000-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WEISSELDINGER, EDOUARD

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI