Global patent index - EP 0990475 A1

EP 0990475 A1 2000-04-05 - Process for producing a cylinder liner and the thus produced cylinder liner

Title (en)

Process for producing a cylinder liner and the thus produced cylinder liner

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Zylinderlaufbuchse sowie die herstellbare Zylinderlaufbuchse

Title (fr)

Procédé à produire une chemise de cylindre et la chemise ainsi produit

Publication

EP 0990475 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115940 A

Priority

DE 19845347 A

Abstract (en)

The cylinder liner, for the cylinders in the motor block for an internal combustion motor, is applied by thermal spraying with a mandrel forming a mold body. The cylinder wall (2) has different wall thicknesses in the peripheral direction, to form partial thickened wall reinforcements (3). The molding mandrel is rotated constantly in relation to the thermal spray to form a cylinder liner wall (2) in a constant thickness. The mandrel is then rotated irregularly in relation to the thermal spray so that thicker wall reinforcements (3) are formed at defined points on the periphery.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Zylinderlaufbuchse 1 zum Einsatz in die Zylinderbohrung eines Metallblocks. Die Zylinderlaufbuchse ist durch thermisches Spritzen hergestellt und weist an der Aussenwand Wanddickenverstärkungen (3,3',3'',3''') auf, die als Rippen ausgebildet sind und eine Armierung der Zylinderlaufbuchse bewirken, so daß beim Eingießen des Motorblocks keine Verzüge auftreten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 23/00; B22D 19/00; F02F 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 17/00 (2006.01); B22D 19/00 (2006.01); B22D 23/00 (2006.01); C23C 4/00 (2006.01); F02F 1/00 (2006.01); F02F 1/08 (2006.01); F02F 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 23/003 (2013.01); B22D 19/0009 (2013.01); F02F 1/004 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49272 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19845347 C1 20000330; EP 0990475 A1 20000405; EP 0990475 B1 20031217; ES 2209296 T3 20040616; JP 2000110658 A 20000418; US 6182629 B1 20010206

INPADOC legal status

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-06-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59908080

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110301

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080814

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080813

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080814

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080813

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080813

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070803

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070813

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070705

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-08-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070807

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2209296

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-03-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908080

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROCESS FOR PRODUCING A CYLINDER LINER AND THE THUS PRODUCED CYLINDER LINER

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021126

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI