Global Patent Index - EP 0990490 A1

EP 0990490 A1 2000-04-05 - Device for positioning, clamping and compacting a ring-shaped holder

Title (en)

Device for positioning, clamping and compacting a ring-shaped holder

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Anordnen, Spannen oder Schrumpfen eines ringförmigen Festhalteorganes

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la mise en place, le serrage et le rétrécissement d'un dispositif de maintien annulaire

Publication

EP 0990490 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98118718 A

Priority

EP 98118718 A

Abstract (en)

An open tension ring (3) with a fixing section (5,7) at each end encloses two ring-shaped clamping jaws (11) which fit with their outer contour (12) against the ring and form a circular ring opening with their inner face (19). At least one spring-like member (15) is set between the clamping jaws to drive these apart and hold them secure in the ring. A tension member with at least two engagement sections engage against the fixing sections and tension the open ring to reduce its diameter. INdependent claims describe method for mounting and an arrangement where the fixing member is inside the clamping jaws to form a ring opening.

Abstract (de)

Für das Anordnen bzw. Spannen oder Schrumpfen eines ringförmigen Festhalteorganes wird eine Vorrichtung vorgeschlagen, welche mindestens die folgenden Elemente aufweist: Einen offenen Spannring (3) mit je endständig einem Festhalteabschnit (5, 7), mindestens zwei, innerhalb des Spannringes angeordnete, ringartig gebogene, weitgehendst seitlich aneinanderstossende Klemmbacken (11), welche mit ihrer äusseren Kontur (12) am Spannring anliegen und welche mit ihrer inneren Oberfläche (19) insgesamt wenigstens nahezu eine kreisrunde Öffnung bilden. Weiter weist die Vorrichtung je mindestens ein federartiges Organ (15) zwischen je den seitlich aneinanderstossenden Klemmbacken auf, um diese voneinanderzutreiben bzw. den Spannring im nicht-gespannten Zustand in Ringöffnungs-Durchmesser-vergrössender Richtung auseinanderzutreiben und die Klemmbacken fest im Spannring zu halten. Mittels eines Spannorgans mit mindestens zwei Eingriffabschnitten, vorgesehen, um an den Festhalteabschnitten einzugreifen, kann der offene Spannring in Durchmesser-verkleinernder Richtung gespannt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 27/10; B21D 39/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 25/00 (2006.01); B25B 27/10 (2006.01); F16B 2/08 (2006.01); F16D 3/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 27/10 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53717 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53987 (2013.01); Y10T 29/53996 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990490 A1 20000405; EP 0990490 B1 20011107; AT 208246 T 20011115; AU 5501199 A 20000426; AU 754451 B2 20021114; BR 9914140 A 20010619; CA 2345974 A1 20000413; CA 2345974 C 20080617; CN 1144660 C 20040407; CN 1321115 A 20011107; DE 59802078 D1 20011213; ES 2167827 T3 20020516; JP 2002526722 A 20020820; JP 4565746 B2 20101020; MX PA01003218 A 20020424; PT 990490 E 20020328; US 6634202 B1 20031021; WO 0020175 A1 20000413; ZA 200102485 B 20011109

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111003

2013-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130606

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111002

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 208246

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20111002

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111003

2012-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111002

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111002

2012-08-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59802078

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-07-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-07-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2012-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111002

2012-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2012-05-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HANS *OETIKER A.G. MASCHINEN- UND APPARATEFABRIK

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-04-10 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101213

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101015

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101019

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101019

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101019

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101020

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101009

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100928

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2167827

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-03-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20011211

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020115

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802078

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-13

2001-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 208246

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI