Global Patent Index - EP 0990510 A2

EP 0990510 A2 2000-04-05 - Method for monitoring the production in the manufacturing of tablets in a rotary machine

Title (en)

Method for monitoring the production in the manufacturing of tablets in a rotary machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Produktionsüberwachung bei der Herstellung von Tabletten in einer Rundläufertablettiermaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé de surveillance de la production dans la fabrication de comprimés par une machine rotative

Publication

EP 0990510 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118500 A

Priority

DE 19844390 A

Abstract (en)

During production an actual mean value is calculated and compared with an ideal mean value and the supply of material to the individual matrix bores is changed when the deviation exceeds a predetermined amount. Before forming the mean value those pressing force mean values are eliminated which deviate significantly from the other measured values. The ordinal number of the pair of rams whose measured value is eliminated is stored and the production interrupted when the ordinal number reaches a predetermined frequency.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Produktionsüberwachung bei der Herstellung von Tabletten in einer Rundläufertablettiermaschine, mit einer Reihe von paarweise angeordneten Ober- und Unterstempeln, die mit Matritzenbohrungen zusammenwirken, bei dem für jedes Stempelpaar das Maximum der Preßkraft gemessen wird, über eine vorgewählte Anzahl von Meßwerten (Meßreihe) ein Ist-Mittelwert berechnet und mit einem Soll-Mittelwert verglichen wird und die Zufuhr von Material zu den einzelnen Matrizenbohrungen (Füllgrad) geändert wird, wenn die Abweichung ein vorgegebenes Maß überschreitet, wobei vor der Mittelwertbildung diejenigen Preßkraftmeßwerte jeder Meßreihe eliminiert werden, die gegenüber den anderen Meßwerten signifikant abweichen (Ausreißertest).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 11/08; B30B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/00 (2006.01); B30B 11/08 (2006.01); B30B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 11/005 (2013.01); B30B 11/08 (2013.01); B30B 15/0094 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990510 A2 20000405; EP 0990510 A3 20000412; EP 0990510 B1 20050216; DE 19844390 A1 20000406; DE 19844390 B4 20050922; US 6319435 B1 20011120

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140918

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140930

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140918

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-06-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150529

2015-06-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59911636

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140918

2015-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59911636

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131107

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130924

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130920

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130923

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-08-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911636

- Representative's name: HAUCK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20110621

2007-10-24 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20070615

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-02-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KORSCH AG

- Effective date: 20051116

2005-06-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-03-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911636 P 20050324

2005-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2005-02-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FETTE GMBH

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000918

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI