Global Patent Index - EP 0990520 A1

EP 0990520 A1 2000-04-05 - Method and device for preventing collision in printing machines

Title (en)

Method and device for preventing collision in printing machines

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kollisionsüberwachung in Druckmaschinen

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif de prévention de collision dans machines d'impression

Publication

EP 0990520 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98116398 A

Priority

EP 98116398 A

Abstract (en)

The collision monitoring method is used for a printing machine with at least one rotating cylinder (18,20) moved in a direction perpendicular to its rotation axis via a setting drive (28,30), with its rotation permitted during the setting movement, the rotation rate and/or the rotary drive torque being monitored, e.g. via a torque sensor and/or an incremental angular position sensor.The monitored signals are evaluated for detecting a collision with another component for halting the setting drive. An Independent claim for a collision mnitoring device is also included.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zur Kollisionsüberwachung in einer Druckmaschine mit wenigstens einem drehantreibbaren Rotationskörper (18; 20) und einem Stellantrieb (28; 30) zum Bewegen des Rotationskörpers in einer zur Drehachse senkrechten Richtung, durch gekennzeichnet, daß ein Drehmomentgeber (T) und/oder ein Winkelinkrementgeber () zur Erfassung des Antriebsdrehmoments und/oder der Drehzahl des Rotationskörpers (18; 20) vorgesehen ist und daß eine Steuereinrichtung (38) dazu eingerichtet ist, eine Kollision des Rotationskörpers mit einem anderen Bauteil anhand des Signals des Drehmoment- oder Winkelinkrementgebers zu erfassen und daraufhin den Stellantrieb (38; 30) stillzusetzen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 5/24 (2006.01); B41F 13/24 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01); B41F 33/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/14 (2013.01); B41P 2233/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] EP 0226554 A1 19870624 - GRAPHIC MACHINE SERVICE SRL [IT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990520 A1 20000405; EP 0990520 B1 20011128; DE 59802253 D1 20020110; ES 2166580 T3 20020416; JP 2000071426 A 20000307; US 6220162 B1 20010424

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130830

2014-09-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140911

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130829

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130829

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59802253

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130829

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120813

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120822

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120822

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120907

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120829

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-11-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2166580

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59802253

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990326

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI