Global Patent Index - EP 0990525 A2

EP 0990525 A2 2000-04-05 - Print head for use in a ballistic aerosol marking apparatus

Title (en)

Print head for use in a ballistic aerosol marking apparatus

Title (de)

Druckkopf zur Verwendung in einer ballistischen Aerosolmarkiervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Tête d'impression utilisée dans un dispositif d'impression ballistique à aérosol

Publication

EP 0990525 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99307688 A

Priority

  • US 16390498 A
  • US 16379998 A

Abstract (en)

A print head is disclosed for use in a marking apparatus in which a propellant stream (A) is passed through a channel (34) and directed toward a substrate (38). Marking material (28), such as ink, toner, etc., is controllably introduced into the propellant stream and imparted with sufficient kinetic energy thereby to be made incident upon the substrate (38). A multiplicity of channels (38) for directing the propellant and marking material allow for high throughput, high resolution marking. Multiple marking materials (28C,28M,28Y,28K) may be introduced into the channel (34) and mixed therein prior to being made incident on the substrate (38), or mixed or superimposed on the substrate (38) without re-registration. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/14; B41J 2/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14008 (2013.01); B41J 2/14 (2013.01); B41J 2202/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9727058 A1 19970731 - TONEJET CORP PTY LTD [AU], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990525 A2 20000405; EP 0990525 A3 20000816; EP 0990525 B1 20060823; DE 69932902 D1 20061005; DE 69932902 T2 20070308; JP 2000108339 A 20000418

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070524

2007-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69932902

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-10-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-08-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010216

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 41J 2/01 A, 7B 41J 2/14 B

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NOOLANDI, JAAN

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LEAN, MENG H.

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PEETERS, ERIC

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: APTE, RAJ B.

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FLOYD, PHILIP D.

2000-05-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: VOLKEL, ARMIN R.

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI