Global Patent Index - EP 0990535 A1

EP 0990535 A1 2000-04-05 - Method for producing printed products by inserting at least a part product in a main product and device for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method for producing printed products by inserting at least a part product in a main product and device for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Druckerzeugnissen durch Einstecken von wenigstens einem Teilprodukt in ein Hauptprodukt und Einrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Méhode pour fabriquer des produits d'imprimerie par insertion d'au moins un produit constituant dans un produit principal et dispositif pour mettre en oeuvre la méthode

Publication

EP 0990535 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810973 A

Priority

EP 98810973 A

Abstract (en)

At a reception station, the incoming products are seized at the fold by grippers on a transporter. They are selectively transferred to a conveyor which takes them from the transporter to an insertion machine on a direct transfer path with the fold at the front. An Independent claim is also included for an apparatus for carrying out the above method.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren dient der Herstellung von Druckerzeugnissen, die durch Einsteckvorgänge in einer an die Auslage (A) einer Druckmaschine anschliessenden Einrichtung vervollständigt werden, wobei die Produkte an der Auslage (A) von Transporteuren (4) einer eine Zwischenspeicheranordnung (7-11) aufweisenden Förderanlage (6) erfasst und wahlweise vor der Zwischenspeicheranlage an einen mit der Einsteckmaschine (16) verbundenen Förderer (13) oder die mit der Einsteckmaschine (16) auslagerungsseitig verbundene Zwischenspeicheranordnung überführt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42C 1/10; B65H 29/60; B65H 29/02; B65H 29/04; B42C 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/04 (2006.01); B42C 1/10 (2006.01); B65H 29/02 (2006.01); B65H 29/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/60 (2013.01); B42C 1/10 (2013.01); B65H 29/003 (2013.01); B65H 2301/323 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4471 (2013.01); B65H 2405/55 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2301/4471 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2301/4471 + B65H 2220/02

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990535 A1 20000405; EP 0990535 B1 20031112; AU 4887899 A 20000330; AU 765062 B2 20030904; DE 59810170 D1 20031218; DK 0990535 T3 20040322; JP 2000103557 A 20000411; US 6254088 B1 20010703

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-04-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-04-24 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160930

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59810170

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120928

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120928

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-05-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120928

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110922

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110920

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-11-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-08-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040118

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810170 P 20031218

2003-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

2003-11-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI