Global Patent Index - EP 0990560 A1

EP 0990560 A1 2000-04-05 - Trunk liner and method of mounting the same

Title (en)

Trunk liner and method of mounting the same

Title (de)

Kofferraum-Verkleidung sowie Verfahren zu deren Montage

Title (fr)

Revêtement de coffre et son procédé de montage

Publication

EP 0990560 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99119370 A

Priority

DE 19845099 A

Abstract (en)

The boot lining comprises a shape stable multi-part element (2) whose parts fold in to reduce the size when placing the lining in the boot. A side lining element has two parts connected for swivel and folding movement by connectors to a centre part. The centre part can have two guide rails set in the drive direction to fix the lining in the boot.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Kofferraum-Verkleidung für ein Kraftfahrzeug, aufweisend mindestens ein formstabiles bzw. biegesteifes mehrteiliges Verkleidungselement (2; 30; 48), dessen Teile zur Verringerung der Baugröße während des Einbaus in den Kofferraum einklappbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 13/01; B60R 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 7/02 (2006.01); B60R 13/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60R 7/02 (2013.01); B60R 13/01 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 2118109 A 19831026 - POYSER ALAN
  • [A] GB 2115754 A 19830914 - AUTOPIA TERAKAT ACCESSORIES LT
  • [A] EP 0266024 A1 19880504 - COLLINS & AIKMAN CORP [US]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 116 (M - 216) 20 May 1983 (1983-05-20)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 116 (M - 216) 20 May 1983 (1983-05-20)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 116 (M - 216) 20 May 1983 (1983-05-20)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990560 A1 20000405; EP 0990560 B1 20040512; DE 19845099 A1 20000413; ES 2221284 T3 20041216

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2013-06-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130606

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909453

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120531

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110302

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110210

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2005-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2221284 T3

2004-07-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: INTIER AUTOMOTIVE NAEHER GMBH

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909453 P 20040617

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020627

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI