Global Patent Index - EP 0990571 A2

EP 0990571 A2 2000-04-05 - Chair lift installation with a conveyor belt for conveying skiers into the entrance area of this installation

Title (en)

Chair lift installation with a conveyor belt for conveying skiers into the entrance area of this installation

Title (de)

Sesselliftanlage mit einem Förderband zur Beförderung von Skifahren in den Einstiegsbereich dieser Anlage

Title (fr)

Installation d'un télésiège avec une bande transporteuse pour transporter des skieurs dans la zone de l'entrée de cette installation

Publication

EP 0990571 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99890169 A

Priority

AT 164098 A

Abstract (en)

The height of the conveyor(2) is adjustable. There is a platform at one end, the height of which is adjustable. The end of the conveyor adjacent the platform can also have its height adjusted. The other end of the conveyor pivots about a horizontal axis.

Abstract (de)

Sesselliftanlage mit einem Förderband (2) zur Beförderung der Skifahrer in den Einstiegsbereich der Anlage, in welcher sie auf die durch den Einstiegsbereich hindurch bewegten Sessel (1) gelangen. Dabei ist das Förderband (2) höhenverstellbar (Fig. 1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 12/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 11/00 (2006.01); B61B 12/00 (2006.01); B61B 12/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 12/022 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990571 A2 20000405; EP 0990571 A3 20000823; CA 2283623 A1 20000401; JP 2000135978 A 20000516

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010224

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INNOVA PATENT GMBH

2000-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZIMMERMANN, DIETER

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI