Global Patent Index - EP 0990573 A2

EP 0990573 A2 2000-04-05 - Method for installing a door frame

Title (en)

Method for installing a door frame

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Einbau eines Türrahmens

Title (fr)

Méthode pour installer un chassis de porte

Publication

EP 0990573 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99109039 A

Priority

DE 19844813 A

Abstract (en)

The door unit (6) has a door frame (8) is held in a rigid holding device (10) which together with the door is brought into its desired position against the car body (1) and is fixed using a bonding agent (13). The holding device is then removed.

Abstract (de)

Um eine Türeinheit 6 mit ihrem Türrahmen 8 in einfacher und kostengünstiger Weise mit einem Wagenkasten 1 verbinden zu können, ohne einen in sich biege- und verwindungssteifen Türrahmen 8 verwenden zu müssen, ist der Türrahmen 8 in einer in sich starren Haltevorrichtung 10 gehalten, mit der zusammen die Türeinheit 6 in ihre Sollposition gegenüber dem Wagenkasten 1 gebracht und mittels einer Kleberverbindung 13 festgesetzt wird. Danach wird die Haltevorrichtung entfernt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 17/04; B60J 5/04; B61D 17/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 5/04 (2006.01); B61D 17/04 (2006.01); B61D 17/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/08 (2013.01); B61D 17/045 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990573 A2 20000405; EP 0990573 A3 20010314; DE 19844813 A1 20000413; HU 223148 B1 20040329; HU 9902946 A2 20000928; HU 9902946 A3 20010528; HU 9902946 D0 19991129; NO 994732 A 20000331; NO 994732 D0 19990929

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-10-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION GMBH

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030710

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE DK ES FR GB IT PT SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER RAIL SYSTEMS GMBH

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI