Global patent index - EP 0990573 A3

EP 0990573 A3 2001-03-14 - Method for installing a door frame

Title (en)

Method for installing a door frame

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Einbau eines Türrahmens

Title (fr)

Méthode pour installer un chassis de porte

Publication

EP 0990573 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109039 A

Priority

DE 19844813 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0990573A2] The door unit (6) has a door frame (8) is held in a rigid holding device (10) which together with the door is brought into its desired position against the car body (1) and is fixed using a bonding agent (13). The holding device is then removed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 17/04; B60J 5/04; B61D 17/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 5/04 (2006.01); B61D 17/04 (2006.01); B61D 17/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/08 (2013.01); B61D 17/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990573 A2 20000405; EP 0990573 A3 20010314; DE 19844813 A1 20000413; HU 223148 B1 20040329; HU 9902946 A2 20000928; HU 9902946 A3 20010528; HU 9902946 D0 19991129; NO 994732 A 20000331; NO 994732 D0 19990929

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-10-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030710

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE DK ES FR GB IT PT SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER RAIL SYSTEMS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI