Global Patent Index - EP 0990574 A2

EP 0990574 A2 2000-04-05 - Vehicle body with a roof closing plate and transverse support ribs

Title (en)

Vehicle body with a roof closing plate and transverse support ribs

Title (de)

Wagenkasten mit Dachabschlussplatte und Querspriegeln

Title (fr)

Caisse de véhicule avec une plaque d'obturation pour le toit et arceaux transversaux

Publication

EP 0990574 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99109032 A

Priority

DE 19844812 A

Abstract (en)

The car has two longitudinal roof beams (2) which support airtight and water tight roof panels (6). The longitudinal beams are connected by transverse arches (3) on which the panels are hung. Additional units for example current collector units or air conditioning are mounted above the roof closing panel and are covered with a coping (14).

Abstract (de)

Ein insbesondere für Schienenfahrzeuge vorgesehener Wagenkasten (1) weist zwei Dachlangträger (2) auf, die eine daran luft- und wasserdicht festgesetzte Dachabschlußplatte (6) tragen. Querspiegel (3) verbinden die Dachlangträger (2). Um einen vereinfachten Aufbau zu erzielen, sind die Querspriegel (3) oberhalb der Dachabschlußplattette (6) angeordnet, wobei auf die Querspriegel (3) Hilfsaggregate (13) aufgesetzt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 17/12; B62D 25/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 17/12 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19521192 A1 19961212 - ABB DAIMLER BENZ TRANSP [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0990574 A2 20000405; EP 0990574 A3 20010314; EP 0990574 B1 20051116; DE 19844812 A1 20000413; DE 59912796 D1 20051222; HU 223147 B1 20040329; HU 9902945 A2 20000928; HU 9902945 A3 20010528; HU 9902945 D0 19991129; IL 131694 A 20031031; IL 131694 D0 20010319; NO 321204 B1 20060403; NO 994731 A 20000331; NO 994731 D0 19990929; US 6626118 B1 20030930

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59912796

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59912796

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100507

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-02-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100507

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100723

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090513

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060518

2006-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-04-17 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060417

2006-02-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060227

2006-02-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060216

2006-02-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060216

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912796 P 20051222

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT PT SE

2005-11-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-11-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051116

2003-10-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION GMBH

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030710

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE DK ES FR GB IT PT SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-04-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER RAIL SYSTEMS GMBH

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI